Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1441 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Creighton S.B. No. 1441
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2017; March 20, 2017, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 3; April 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right of certain appellants to supersede a judgment
 or order on appeal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.004, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The supreme court shall adopt rules to provide that the
 right of an appellant under Section 6.001(b)(1), (2), or (3), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, to supersede a judgment or order on
 appeal is not subject to being counter-superseded under Rule
 24.2(a)(3), Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure, or any other rule.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Supreme Court shall adopt the rules
 required by Section 22.004(i), Government Code, as added by this
 Act, before May 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *