Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2227 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2017

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017