9 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 623.364(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
10 | | - | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | | - | (a) The authority may collect a fee for permits issued under |
---|
12 | | - | this subchapter. Beginning September 1, 2017 [2013], the maximum |
---|
13 | | - | amount of the fee may not exceed $200 [$80] per trip. On September 1 |
---|
14 | | - | of each subsequent year, the authority may adjust the maximum fee |
---|
15 | | - | amount as necessary to reflect the percentage change during the |
---|
16 | | - | preceding year in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers |
---|
17 | | - | (CPI-U), U.S. City Average, published monthly by the United States |
---|
18 | | - | Bureau of Labor Statistics or its successor in function. |
---|
| 13 | + | SECTION 1. Section 623.364, Transportation Code, is amended |
---|
| 14 | + | to read as follows: |
---|
| 15 | + | Sec. 623.364. PERMIT FEES. (a) The authority may collect a |
---|
| 16 | + | fee for permits issued under this subchapter. Beginning September |
---|
| 17 | + | 1, 2017 [2013], the maximum amount of the fee may not exceed $200 |
---|
| 18 | + | [$80] per trip. On September 1 of each subsequent year, the |
---|
| 19 | + | authority may adjust the maximum fee amount as necessary to reflect |
---|
| 20 | + | the percentage change during the preceding year in the Consumer |
---|
| 21 | + | Price Index for All Urban Consumers (CPI-U), U.S. City Average, |
---|
| 22 | + | published monthly by the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics |
---|
| 23 | + | or its successor in function. |
---|
| 24 | + | (b) Except as provided by Subsection (d), fees [Fees] |
---|
| 25 | + | collected under Subsection (a) shall be used only for the |
---|
| 26 | + | construction and maintenance of the roads described by or |
---|
| 27 | + | designated under Section 623.363 and for the authority's |
---|
| 28 | + | administrative costs, which may not exceed: |
---|
| 29 | + | (1) 15 percent of the fees collected from the issuance |
---|
| 30 | + | of permits authorizing the movement of oversize or overweight |
---|
| 31 | + | vehicles on a road not listed in Section 623.363(a)(1)(J), (K), |
---|
| 32 | + | (L), or (M); or |
---|
| 33 | + | (2) 15 percent of the fees collected from the issuance |
---|
| 34 | + | of permits authorizing the movement of oversize or overweight |
---|
| 35 | + | vehicles on a road listed in Section 623.363(a)(1)(J), (K), (L), or |
---|
| 36 | + | (M) minus the amount of fees used under Subsection (d). |
---|
| 37 | + | (c) The authority shall make payments to the Texas |
---|
| 38 | + | Department of Transportation to provide funds for the maintenance |
---|
| 39 | + | of roads and highways subject to this subchapter. |
---|
| 40 | + | (d) Fees collected under Subsection (a) from the issuance of |
---|
| 41 | + | permits authorizing the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles |
---|
| 42 | + | on a road listed in Section 623.363(a)(1)(J), (K), (L), or (M) must |
---|
| 43 | + | be used in an amount not to exceed five percent of those fees to |
---|
| 44 | + | leverage funding from other sources to: |
---|
| 45 | + | (1) construct a bridge on Farm-to-Market Road 1015 in |
---|
| 46 | + | Hidalgo County between Military Highway and Mile 5 Road North; |
---|
| 47 | + | (2) improve the roads described by Section 623.363 |
---|
| 48 | + | that are in Weslaco or Progreso; |
---|
| 49 | + | (3) improve Mile 5 Road North in Hidalgo County; and |
---|
| 50 | + | (4) support the construction of roads proposed by the |
---|
| 51 | + | City of Donna connecting a proposed commercial import lot near the |
---|
| 52 | + | Donna-Rio Bravo International Bridge to Farm-to-Market Road 493 and |
---|
| 53 | + | Military Highway. |
---|
20 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
21 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
22 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2227 passed the Senate on |
---|
23 | | - | April 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4; |
---|
24 | | - | May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
25 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House |
---|
26 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted |
---|
27 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 26, |
---|
28 | | - | Nays 4. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
31 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2227 passed the House, with |
---|
32 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 101, |
---|
33 | | - | Nays 34, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted |
---|
34 | | - | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
35 | | - | May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
36 | | - | following vote: Yeas 115, Nays 24, two present not voting. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
39 | | - | Approved: |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Date |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Governor |
---|