Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2227 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2017

                            S.B. No. 2227


 AN ACT
 relating to an increase in the fee for permits issued for the
 movement of oversize or overweight vehicles carrying cargo in
 Hidalgo County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 623.364(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The authority may collect a fee for permits issued under
 this subchapter.  Beginning September 1, 2017 [2013], the maximum
 amount of the fee may not exceed $200 [$80] per trip. On September 1
 of each subsequent year, the authority may adjust the maximum fee
 amount as necessary to reflect the percentage change during the
 preceding year in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers
 (CPI-U), U.S. City Average, published monthly by the United States
 Bureau of Labor Statistics or its successor in function.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2227 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays 4;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 26,
 Nays 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2227 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 101,
 Nays 34, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 115, Nays 24, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor