Senate | 04/25/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 893 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 465 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 235 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 191 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 130 | |
Senate | 12/07/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/07/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |