Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB275 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Watson, et al. S.B. No. 275
22 (In the Senate - Filed December 7, 2016; January 30, 2017,
33 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
44 April 4, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 5; April 4, 2017,
66 sent to printer.)
77 Click here to see the committee vote
88 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 275 By: Watson
99
1010
1111 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1212 AN ACT
1313 relating to the retention and use of sales tax revenue collected by
1414 certain retailers to provide job training and placement services to
1515 certain persons.
1616 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1717 SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
1818 by adding Section 151.433 to read as follows:
1919 Sec. 151.433. USE OF SALES TAX COLLECTIONS FOR JOB TRAINING
2020 AND PLACEMENT. (a) In this section:
2121 (1) "Qualifying organization" means a retailer
2222 certified by the comptroller under Subsection (b).
2323 (2) "Workforce training community center" means a
2424 retailer that:
2525 (A) is exempt from the payment of federal income
2626 taxes under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being
2727 listed as an exempt organization under Section 501(c)(3) of that
2828 code;
2929 (B) collects and remits to the comptroller sales
3030 taxes imposed on the sale of donated goods;
3131 (C) has experience in assisting persons with a
3232 disability or other barriers to employment with job training and
3333 placement services and uses a portion of its revenue to provide
3434 those services; and
3535 (D) has annual sales of at least $1 million.
3636 (b) A retailer may apply to the comptroller for
3737 certification as a qualifying organization under this section. If
3838 the comptroller determines that the applicant meets the
3939 requirements to be a workforce training community center, the
4040 comptroller shall certify the applicant as a qualifying
4141 organization.
4242 (c) Notwithstanding any other law, a qualifying
4343 organization is not required to remit to the comptroller and may
4444 retain:
4545 (1) the lesser of 30 percent or $1 million of the sales
4646 taxes imposed under this chapter and collected by the organization
4747 on sales during its first year of certification as a qualifying
4848 organization; and
4949 (2) the lesser of 50 percent or $1 million of the sales
5050 taxes imposed under this chapter and collected by the organization
5151 on sales during each subsequent year of the remaining period in
5252 which the qualifying organization holds that certification,
5353 including a renewal certification.
5454 (d) A qualifying organization must show the amount of sales
5555 taxes retained as authorized by Subsection (c) on a tax report
5656 required by this chapter in addition to the information required by
5757 Section 151.406.
5858 (e) A qualifying organization shall continue to remit to the
5959 comptroller sales taxes imposed by a political subdivision of this
6060 state and collected on sales with respect to which the qualifying
6161 organization retains sales taxes as authorized by Subsection (c).
6262 (f) The reimbursement authorized by Section 151.423 and the
6363 deduction authorized by Section 151.424 do not apply with respect
6464 to the amount of sales taxes retained as authorized by Subsection
6565 (c).
6666 (g) Except as provided by Subsection (h), a qualifying
6767 organization shall use money retained as authorized by Subsection
6868 (c) only to:
6969 (1) provide a variety of job training and placement
7070 services to persons with a disability or other barriers to
7171 employment, including low educational attainment, a criminal
7272 record, homelessness, and status as a veteran;
7373 (2) develop an individualized written training and
7474 employment plan for each person assisted to ensure appropriate and
7575 successful job placement; and
7676 (3) monitor job retention for each person placed for
7777 the first 90 days of employment and provide additional services as
7878 needed to support job retention or acquisition of a different job.
7979 (h) In its first year of certification, a qualifying
8080 organization may use money retained as authorized by Subsection (c)
8181 to improve its infrastructure and otherwise prepare to provide
8282 services described by Subsection (g). This subsection does not
8383 apply to the period after a qualifying organization's certification
8484 is renewed under Subsection (n).
8585 (i) After the period described by Subsection (h), for every
8686 $10,000 in sales tax collections retained under this section a
8787 qualifying organization:
8888 (1) shall provide job training and placement services
8989 to at least three persons, including services related to
9090 job-seeking skills and vocational skills training, job placement,
9191 job coaching, and post-employment support; and
9292 (2) must successfully place an average of at least
9393 2.25 persons in jobs.
9494 (j) Subject to Subsection (k), a retailer that is certified
9595 as a qualifying organization retains that certification until the
9696 third anniversary of the date of certification. At any time after
9797 the period described by Subsection (h) during the certification
9898 period, the comptroller may, and at the conclusion of the
9999 certification period the comptroller shall, require the qualifying
100100 organization to demonstrate, in a manner prescribed by the
101101 comptroller, that the qualifying organization:
102102 (1) has not used any tax collections retained under
103103 this section for a purpose other than a purpose described by
104104 Subsection (g) after the first year of certification; and
105105 (2) is successfully meeting or has successfully met,
106106 as applicable, the requirements described by Subsection (i).
107107 (k) The comptroller, after written notice and a hearing, may
108108 revoke a certification issued to a retailer that fails to comply
109109 with this chapter or a rule adopted under this chapter. A retailer
110110 whose certification the comptroller proposes to revoke under this
111111 section is entitled to 20 days' written notice of the time and place
112112 of the hearing on the revocation. The notice must state the reason
113113 the comptroller is seeking to revoke the retailer's certification.
114114 At the hearing the retailer must show cause why the retailer's
115115 certification should not be revoked.
116116 (l) The comptroller shall give written notice of the
117117 revocation of a certification under Subsection (k) to the retailer
118118 that was certified under this section. The notice may be sent by
119119 mail to the retailer's address as shown in the comptroller's
120120 records.
121121 (m) The comptroller shall require an organization whose
122122 certification was revoked under Subsection (k) to remit an amount
123123 of tax collections retained under this section in the comptroller's
124124 discretion, but not to exceed $3,333 per person not successfully
125125 placed in a job in accordance with Subsection (i)(2).
126126 (n) A retailer that is certified as a qualifying
127127 organization may apply to renew the certification. The comptroller
128128 may renew a retailer's certification only if the retailer has
129129 complied with all requirements during the applicant's
130130 certification period and with any other requirements for renewal as
131131 prescribed by rules adopted by the comptroller.
132132 (o) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the comptroller may not
133133 certify a retailer as a qualifying organization under that
134134 subsection before September 1, 2019. The authorization to retain
135135 sales taxes provided by Subsection (c) applies only to sales taxes
136136 imposed under this chapter and collected by a qualifying
137137 organization on or after September 1, 2019. This subsection
138138 expires January 1, 2020.
139139 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act does not
140140 affect tax liability accruing before September 1, 2019. That
141141 liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been enacted,
142142 and the former law is continued in effect for the collection of
143143 taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of the liability
144144 for those taxes.
145145 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2018.
146146 * * * * *