Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB275 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson, et al. S.B. No. 275
 (In the Senate - Filed December 7, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 4, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 5; April 4, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 275 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the retention and use of sales tax revenue collected by
 certain retailers to provide job training and placement services to
 certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.433 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.433.  USE OF SALES TAX COLLECTIONS FOR JOB TRAINING
 AND PLACEMENT. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Qualifying organization" means a retailer
 certified by the comptroller under Subsection (b).
 (2)  "Workforce training community center" means a
 retailer that:
 (A)  is exempt from the payment of federal income
 taxes under Section 501(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being
 listed as an exempt organization under Section 501(c)(3) of that
 code;
 (B)  collects and remits to the comptroller sales
 taxes imposed on the sale of donated goods;
 (C)  has experience in assisting persons with a
 disability or other barriers to employment with job training and
 placement services and uses a portion of its revenue to provide
 those services; and
 (D)  has annual sales of at least $1 million.
 (b)  A retailer may apply to the comptroller for
 certification as a qualifying organization under this section. If
 the comptroller determines that the applicant meets the
 requirements to be a workforce training community center, the
 comptroller shall certify the applicant as a qualifying
 organization.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other law, a qualifying
 organization is not required to remit to the comptroller and may
 retain:
 (1)  the lesser of 30 percent or $1 million of the sales
 taxes imposed under this chapter and collected by the organization
 on sales during its first year of certification as a qualifying
 organization; and
 (2)  the lesser of 50 percent or $1 million of the sales
 taxes imposed under this chapter and collected by the organization
 on sales during each subsequent year of the remaining period in
 which the qualifying organization holds that certification,
 including a renewal certification.
 (d)  A qualifying organization must show the amount of sales
 taxes retained as authorized by Subsection (c) on a tax report
 required by this chapter in addition to the information required by
 Section 151.406.
 (e)  A qualifying organization shall continue to remit to the
 comptroller sales taxes imposed by a political subdivision of this
 state and collected on sales with respect to which the qualifying
 organization retains sales taxes as authorized by Subsection (c).
 (f)  The reimbursement authorized by Section 151.423 and the
 deduction authorized by Section 151.424 do not apply with respect
 to the amount of sales taxes retained as authorized by Subsection
 (c).
 (g)  Except as provided by Subsection (h), a qualifying
 organization shall use money retained as authorized by Subsection
 (c) only to:
 (1)  provide a variety of job training and placement
 services to persons with a disability or other barriers to
 employment, including low educational attainment, a criminal
 record, homelessness, and status as a veteran;
 (2)  develop an individualized written training and
 employment plan for each person assisted to ensure appropriate and
 successful job placement; and
 (3)  monitor job retention for each person placed for
 the first 90 days of employment and provide additional services as
 needed to support job retention or acquisition of a different job.
 (h)  In its first year of certification, a qualifying
 organization may use money retained as authorized by Subsection (c)
 to improve its infrastructure and otherwise prepare to provide
 services described by Subsection (g).  This subsection does not
 apply to the period after a qualifying organization's certification
 is renewed under Subsection (n).
 (i)  After the period described by Subsection (h), for every
 $10,000 in sales tax collections retained under this section a
 qualifying organization:
 (1)  shall provide job training and placement services
 to at least three persons, including services related to
 job-seeking skills and vocational skills training, job placement,
 job coaching, and post-employment support; and
 (2)  must successfully place an average of at least
 2.25 persons in jobs.
 (j)  Subject to Subsection (k), a retailer that is certified
 as a qualifying organization retains that certification until the
 third anniversary of the date of certification.  At any time after
 the period described by Subsection (h) during the certification
 period, the comptroller may, and at the conclusion of the
 certification period the comptroller shall, require the qualifying
 organization to demonstrate, in a manner prescribed by the
 comptroller, that the qualifying organization:
 (1)  has not used any tax collections retained under
 this section for a purpose other than a purpose described by
 Subsection (g) after the first year of certification; and
 (2)  is successfully meeting or has successfully met,
 as applicable, the requirements described by Subsection (i).
 (k)  The comptroller, after written notice and a hearing, may
 revoke a certification issued to a retailer that fails to comply
 with this chapter or a rule adopted under this chapter.  A retailer
 whose certification the comptroller proposes to revoke under this
 section is entitled to 20 days' written notice of the time and place
 of the hearing on the revocation.  The notice must state the reason
 the comptroller is seeking to revoke the retailer's certification.
 At the hearing the retailer must show cause why the retailer's
 certification should not be revoked.
 (l)  The comptroller shall give written notice of the
 revocation of a certification under Subsection (k) to the retailer
 that was certified under this section.  The notice may be sent by
 mail to the retailer's address as shown in the comptroller's
 records.
 (m)  The comptroller shall require an organization whose
 certification was revoked under Subsection (k) to remit an amount
 of tax collections retained under this section in the comptroller's
 discretion, but not to exceed $3,333 per person not successfully
 placed in a job in accordance with Subsection (i)(2).
 (n)  A retailer that is certified as a qualifying
 organization may apply to renew the certification. The comptroller
 may renew a retailer's certification only if the retailer has
 complied with all requirements during the applicant's
 certification period and with any other requirements for renewal as
 prescribed by rules adopted by the comptroller.
 (o)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the comptroller may not
 certify a retailer as a qualifying organization under that
 subsection before September 1, 2019.  The authorization to retain
 sales taxes provided by Subsection (c) applies only to sales taxes
 imposed under this chapter and collected by a qualifying
 organization on or after September 1, 2019. This subsection
 expires January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before September 1, 2019. That
 liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been enacted,
 and the former law is continued in effect for the collection of
 taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of the liability
 for those taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2018.
 * * * * *