LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB30
Draft Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB30
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB30
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
March 10, 2017
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 29, 2017
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 29, 2017
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 10, 2017
Compare
Bill
March 22, 2017
Compare