Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB30 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2017

                            S.B. No. 30


 AN ACT
 relating to inclusion of instruction regarding interaction with
 peace officers in the required curriculum for certain public school
 students and in driver education courses and to civilian
 interaction training for peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Community Safety
 Education Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.012.  INSTRUCTION ON INTERACTION WITH LAW
 ENFORCEMENT. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Board" means the State Board of Education.
 (2)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on Law
 Enforcement.
 (3)  "Driver training school" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 1001.001.
 (b)  The board and the commission shall enter into a
 memorandum of understanding that establishes each agency's
 respective responsibilities in developing instruction, including
 curriculum and instructional modules, on proper interaction with
 peace officers during traffic stops and other in-person encounters.
 The instruction must include information regarding:
 (1)  the role of law enforcement and the duties and
 responsibilities of peace officers;
 (2)  a person's rights concerning interactions with
 peace officers;
 (3)  proper behavior for civilians and peace officers
 during interactions;
 (4)  laws regarding questioning and detention by peace
 officers, including any law requiring a person to present proof of
 identity to a peace officer, and the consequences for a person's or
 officer's failure to comply with those laws; and
 (5)  how and where to file a complaint against or a
 compliment on behalf of a peace officer.
 (c)  In developing the instruction under this section, the
 board and the commission may consult with any interested party,
 including a volunteer work group convened for the purpose of making
 recommendations regarding the instruction.
 (d)  Before finalizing any instruction under this section,
 the board and the commission shall provide a reasonable period for
 public comment.
 (e)  Subject to rules adopted by the board, a school district
 or open-enrollment charter school may tailor the instruction
 developed under this section as appropriate for the district's or
 school's community.  In tailoring the instruction, the district or
 school shall solicit input from local law enforcement agencies,
 driver training schools, and the community.
 SECTION 3.  Section 28.025, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-20) to read as follows:
 (b-20)  The State Board of Education shall adopt rules to
 include the instruction developed under Section 28.012 in one or
 more courses in the required curriculum for students in grade
 levels 9 through 12.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1001.109 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.109.  INFORMATION RELATING TO TRAFFIC STOPS.
 (a)  The commission by rule shall require that information relating
 to law enforcement procedures for traffic stops be included in the
 curriculum of each driver education course and driving safety
 course.  The curriculum must include:
 (1)  a demonstration of the proper actions to be taken
 during a traffic stop; and
 (2)  information regarding:
 (A)  the role of law enforcement and the duties
 and responsibilities of peace officers;
 (B)  a person's rights concerning interactions
 with peace officers;
 (C)  proper behavior for civilians and peace
 officers during interactions;
 (D)  laws regarding questioning and detention by
 peace officers, including any law requiring a person to present
 proof of identity to a peace officer, and the consequences for a
 person's or officer's failure to comply with those laws; and
 (E)  how and where to file a complaint against or a
 compliment on behalf of a peace officer.
 (b)  In developing the curriculum under this section, the
 commission may consult with any interested party, including a
 volunteer work group convened for the purpose of making
 recommendations regarding the curriculum.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1701.253, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (n) to read as follows:
 (n)  As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
 commission shall require an officer to complete the civilian
 interaction training program developed under Section 1701.268. An
 officer shall complete the program not later than the second
 anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under this chapter
 unless the officer completes the program as part of the officer's
 basic training course.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.268 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.268.  CIVILIAN INTERACTION TRAINING PROGRAM.
 (a)  In this section, "board" means the State Board of Education.
 (b)  The commission and the board shall enter into a
 memorandum of understanding that establishes each agency's
 respective responsibilities in developing a training program,
 including training and testing materials, on proper interaction
 with civilians during traffic stops and other in-person encounters.
 The training program must include information regarding:
 (1)  the role of law enforcement and the duties and
 responsibilities of peace officers;
 (2)  a person's rights concerning interactions with
 peace officers;
 (3)  proper behavior for civilians and peace officers
 during interactions;
 (4)  laws regarding questioning and detention by peace
 officers, including any law requiring a person to present proof of
 identity to a peace officer, and the consequences for a person's or
 officer's failure to comply with those laws; and
 (5)  how and where to file a complaint against or a
 compliment on behalf of a peace officer.
 (c)  In developing the training program under this section,
 the commission and the board may consult with any interested party,
 including a volunteer work group convened for the purpose of making
 recommendations regarding the training program.
 (d)  Before finalizing a training program under this
 section, the commission and the board shall provide a reasonable
 period for public comment.
 SECTION 7.  (a)  Not later than September 1, 2018:
 (1)  the State Board of Education and the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall develop:
 (A)  the instruction required under Section
 28.012, Education Code, as added by this Act; and
 (B)  the training program required under Section
 1701.268, Occupations Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation
 shall adopt rules regarding the curriculum required under Section
 1001.109, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Section 28.025(b-20), Education Code, as added by this
 Act, applies beginning with the 2018-2019 school year.
 (c)  A peace officer or reserve law enforcement officer who
 holds a license under Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, issued on or
 before January 1, 2018, shall complete a training program
 established under Section 1701.268, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, not later than January 1, 2020.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 30 passed the Senate on
 March 29, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 27, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 30 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 109,
 Nays 27, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 129, Nays 19, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor