13 | 13 | | amended by adding Section 28.012 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 28.012. INSTRUCTION ON INTERACTION WITH LAW |
---|
15 | 15 | | ENFORCEMENT. (a) In this section: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) "Board" means the State Board of Education. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) "Commission" means the Texas Commission on Law |
---|
18 | 18 | | Enforcement. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (3) "Driver training school" has the meaning assigned |
---|
20 | 20 | | by Section 1001.001. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The board and the commission shall enter into a |
---|
22 | 22 | | memorandum of understanding that establishes each agency's |
---|
23 | 23 | | respective responsibilities in developing instruction, including |
---|
24 | 24 | | curriculum and instructional modules, on proper interaction with |
---|
25 | 25 | | peace officers during traffic stops and other in-person encounters. |
---|
26 | 26 | | The instruction must include information regarding: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) the role of law enforcement and the duties and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (c) In developing the instruction under this section, the |
---|
40 | 40 | | board and the commission may consult with any interested party, |
---|
41 | 41 | | including a volunteer work group convened for the purpose of making |
---|
42 | 42 | | recommendations regarding the instruction. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (d) Before finalizing any instruction under this section, |
---|
44 | 44 | | the board and the commission shall provide a reasonable period for |
---|
45 | 45 | | public comment. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (e) Subject to rules adopted by the board, a school district |
---|
47 | 47 | | or open-enrollment charter school may tailor the instruction |
---|
48 | 48 | | developed under this section as appropriate for the district's or |
---|
49 | 49 | | school's community. In tailoring the instruction, the district or |
---|
50 | 50 | | school shall solicit input from local law enforcement agencies, |
---|
51 | 51 | | driver training schools, and the community. |
---|
59 | 59 | | amended by adding Section 1001.109 to read as follows: |
---|
60 | 60 | | Sec. 1001.109. INFORMATION RELATING TO TRAFFIC STOPS. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (a) The commission by rule shall require that information relating |
---|
62 | 62 | | to law enforcement procedures for traffic stops be included in the |
---|
63 | 63 | | curriculum of each driver education course and driving safety |
---|
64 | 64 | | course. The curriculum must include: |
---|
65 | 65 | | (1) a demonstration of the proper actions to be taken |
---|
66 | 66 | | during a traffic stop; and |
---|
67 | 67 | | (2) information regarding: |
---|
68 | 68 | | (A) the role of law enforcement and the duties |
---|
94 | 94 | | amended by adding Section 1701.268 to read as follows: |
---|
95 | 95 | | Sec. 1701.268. CIVILIAN INTERACTION TRAINING PROGRAM. |
---|
96 | 96 | | (a) In this section, "board" means the State Board of Education. |
---|
97 | 97 | | (b) The commission and the board shall enter into a |
---|
98 | 98 | | memorandum of understanding that establishes each agency's |
---|
99 | 99 | | respective responsibilities in developing a training program, |
---|
100 | 100 | | including training and testing materials, on proper interaction |
---|
101 | 101 | | with civilians during traffic stops and other in-person encounters. |
---|
102 | 102 | | The training program must include information regarding: |
---|
103 | 103 | | (1) the role of law enforcement and the duties and |
---|
115 | 115 | | (c) In developing the training program under this section, |
---|
116 | 116 | | the commission and the board may consult with any interested party, |
---|
117 | 117 | | including a volunteer work group convened for the purpose of making |
---|
118 | 118 | | recommendations regarding the training program. |
---|
119 | 119 | | (d) Before finalizing a training program under this |
---|
120 | 120 | | section, the commission and the board shall provide a reasonable |
---|
121 | 121 | | period for public comment. |
---|
123 | 123 | | (1) the State Board of Education and the Texas |
---|
124 | 124 | | Commission on Law Enforcement shall develop: |
---|
125 | 125 | | (A) the instruction required under Section |
---|
126 | 126 | | 28.012, Education Code, as added by this Act; and |
---|
127 | 127 | | (B) the training program required under Section |
---|
128 | 128 | | 1701.268, Occupations Code, as added by this Act; and |
---|
129 | 129 | | (2) the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation |
---|
130 | 130 | | shall adopt rules regarding the curriculum required under Section |
---|
131 | 131 | | 1001.109, Education Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
132 | 132 | | (b) Section 28.025(b-20), Education Code, as added by this |
---|
133 | 133 | | Act, applies beginning with the 2018-2019 school year. |
---|
134 | 134 | | (c) A peace officer or reserve law enforcement officer who |
---|
135 | 135 | | holds a license under Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, issued on or |
---|
136 | 136 | | before January 1, 2018, shall complete a training program |
---|
137 | 137 | | established under Section 1701.268, Occupations Code, as added by |
---|
138 | 138 | | this Act, not later than January 1, 2020. |
---|
139 | | - | SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
140 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
141 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
142 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 30 passed the Senate on |
---|
143 | | - | March 29, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
144 | | - | May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
145 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House |
---|
146 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 27, 2017, Senate adopted |
---|
147 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
148 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
149 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
150 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
151 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 30 passed the House, with |
---|
152 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 109, |
---|
153 | | - | Nays 27, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted |
---|
154 | | - | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
155 | | - | May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
156 | | - | following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 19, one present not voting. |
---|
157 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
158 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
159 | | - | Approved: |
---|
160 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
161 | | - | Date |
---|
162 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
163 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 139 | + | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|