E
|
06/09/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3292
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2494
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4182
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1535
|
Journal Page: 4182
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4182
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4182
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Cain
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Cain
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Cain
|
Journal Page: 4046
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4046
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3746
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2124
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1032
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1031
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Buckingham
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|