LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB317
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB317
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB317
Compare Versions
SB317 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB317 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB317 Enrolled May 25, 2017
SB317 Comm Sub May 17, 2017
SB317 Engrossed April 18, 2017
SB317 Comm Sub April 3, 2017
SB317 Introduced March 7, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB317 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB317 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB317 Enrolled May 25, 2017
SB317 Comm Sub May 17, 2017
SB317 Engrossed April 18, 2017
SB317 Comm Sub April 3, 2017
SB317 Introduced March 7, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare