Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 7, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill April 18, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2017
Bill April 3, 2017