House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3391 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/17/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 858 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 175 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 12/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |