Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB327 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill December 15, 2016

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill April 3, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017