Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB331 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill December 15, 2016

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 22, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2017
Bill February 27, 2017