Senate | 05/02/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1570 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 12/15/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/15/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |