Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB334 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West S.B. No. 334
 (In the Senate - Filed December 15, 2016; January 30, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 2, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 2, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to broker agreements for the leasing of real property
 owned by a county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 263.008(b), (c), (d), and (e), Local
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The commissioners court of a county may contract with a
 broker to sell or lease a tract of real property that is owned by the
 county.
 (c)  The commissioners court of a county may pay a fee if a
 broker produces a ready, willing, and able buyer or lessee to
 purchase or lease a tract of real property.
 (d)  If a contract made under Subsection (b) requires a
 broker to list the tract of real property for sale or lease for at
 least 30 days with a multiple-listing service used by other brokers
 in the county, the commissioners court on or after the 30th day
 after the date the property is listed may sell or lease the tract of
 real property to a ready, willing, and able buyer or lessee who is
 produced by any broker using the multiple-listing service and who
 submits the highest cash offer.
 (e)  The commissioners court may sell or lease a tract of
 real property under this section without complying with the
 requirements for conducting a public auction, including the
 requirements prescribed by Section 263.001.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *