E
|
05/07/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
05/07/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
E
|
05/04/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2644
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2507
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1688
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1606
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1369
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#496
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2020
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Motion to suspend rules withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1952
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
145-Minjarez
|
Journal Page: 1951
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1927
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
75-Rinaldi
|
Journal Page: 1927
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
74-J. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1927
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
73-Walle
|
Journal Page: 1926
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
70-Bernal
|
Journal Page: 1923
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Amended
|
66-Schofield
|
Journal Page: 1921
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#440
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
49-Alvarado
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
47-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1904
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amended
|
40-Neave
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 41 and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1893
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
9-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1875
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
19-Collier
|
Journal Page: 1873
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
18-Bernal
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 20(h)
|
Journal Page: 1870
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
15-Bernal
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
10-Rinaldi, et al.
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Substitute amendment to amendment fails
|
12-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1865
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
9-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
House
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#365
|
Journal Page: 1778
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 1776
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Motion to adopt Calendars Committee rule
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 582
|
House
|
02/09/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 270
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 271
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 243
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 243
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 243
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 257
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 231
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 231
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 231
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 231
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 231
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA39 Garcia
|
Journal Page: 230
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 230
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 230
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 220
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 208
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 234
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 176
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 137
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 90
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 90
|
Senate
|
01/17/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 38
|
Senate
|
01/11/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 36
|
Senate
|
01/10/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 18
|
Senate
|
11/15/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|