LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB4
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB4
Compare Versions
SB4 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB4 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB4 Enrolled May 3, 2017
SB4 Comm Sub April 20, 2017
SB4 Engrossed February 8, 2017
SB4 Comm Sub February 3, 2017
SB4 Introduced November 15, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB4 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB4 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB4 Enrolled May 3, 2017
SB4 Comm Sub April 20, 2017
SB4 Engrossed February 8, 2017
SB4 Comm Sub February 3, 2017
SB4 Introduced November 15, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare