Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill November 15, 2016

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 8, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill May 3, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2017
Bill February 3, 2017