Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB455 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 11, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2017
Bill April 10, 2017