House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 04/28/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1534 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA3 Watson | Journal Page: 1353 |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1352 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1351 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1351 | |
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/11/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |