Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB457 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Campbell, Huffines S.B. No. 457
 (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 4; April 24, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 457 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to funding for an open-enrollment charter school based on
 the guaranteed level of state and local funds provided to school
 districts through the existing debt allotment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.106, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  In addition to other amounts provided by this section, a
 charter holder is entitled to receive, for the open-enrollment
 charter school, funding per student in average daily attendance in
 an amount equal to the guaranteed level of state and local funds per
 student per cent of tax effort under Section 46.032(a) multiplied
 by the state average interest and sinking fund tax rate imposed by
 school districts for the current year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *