Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB457 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Campbell, Huffines S.B. No. 457
2- (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2017; February 6, 2017,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
4- April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 4; April 24, 2017,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 457 By: Campbell
1+By: Campbell, Bettencourt S.B. No. 457
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
13- relating to funding for an open-enrollment charter school based on
6+ relating to funding for an open-enrollment charter school and to
147 the guaranteed level of state and local funds provided to school
158 districts through the existing debt allotment.
169 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1710 SECTION 1. Section 12.106, Education Code, is amended by
1811 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
1912 (d) In addition to other amounts provided by this section, a
2013 charter holder is entitled to receive, for the open-enrollment
2114 charter school, funding per student in average daily attendance in
2215 an amount equal to the guaranteed level of state and local funds per
2316 student per cent of tax effort under Section 46.032(a) multiplied
24- by the state average interest and sinking fund tax rate imposed by
25- school districts for the current year.
26- SECTION 2. This Act takes effect only if a specific
17+ by the lesser of:
18+ (1) the state average interest and sinking fund tax
19+ rate imposed by school districts for the current year; or
20+ (2) a rate that would result in the total
21+ appropriation under this subsection to be $100,000,000, which is to
22+ be split equally between charter schools and school districts.
23+ SECTION 2. Section 46.032(a), Education Code, is amended to
24+ read as follows:
25+ (a) Each school district is guaranteed a specified amount
26+ per student in state and local funds for each cent of tax effort to
27+ pay the principal of and interest on eligible bonds. The amount of
28+ state support, subject only to the maximum amount under Section
29+ 46.034, is determined by the formula:
30+ EDA = (EDGL X ADA X EDTR X 100) - (EDTR X (DPV/100))
31+ where:
32+ "EDA" is the amount of state funds to be allocated to the
33+ district for assistance with existing debt;
34+ "EDGL" is the dollar amount guaranteed level of state and
35+ local funds per student per cent of tax effort, which is $40 [$35]
36+ or a greater amount for any year provided by appropriation;
37+ "ADA" is the number of students in average daily attendance,
38+ as determined under Section 42.005, in the district;
39+ "EDTR" is the existing debt tax rate of the district, which is
40+ determined by dividing the amount budgeted by the district for
41+ payment of eligible bonds by the quotient of the district's taxable
42+ value of property as determined under Subchapter M, Chapter 403,
43+ Government Code, or, if applicable, under Section 42.2521, divided
44+ by 100; and
45+ "DPV" is the district's taxable value of property as
46+ determined under Subchapter M, Chapter 403, Government Code, or, if
47+ applicable, under Section 42.2521.
48+ SECTION 3. This Act takes effect only if a specific
2749 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
2850 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
29- SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
30- * * * * *
51+ SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2018.