Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB637 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Huffines S.B. No. 637
 (In the Senate - Filed January 27, 2017; February 13, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; April 27, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 637 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to audits of a regional mobility authority by the state
 auditor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 370.318 to read as follows:
 Sec. 370.318.  AUDIT REQUIREMENT FOR DEPARTMENT GRANT OR
 LOAN. The department may not make a grant or loan to an authority
 for a transportation project unless the authority agrees in writing
 to allow state audits of the authority at any time until the
 completion of the transportation project for which the funds are
 granted or loaned at the discretion of the legislative audit
 committee established under Section 321.002, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 321, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 321.024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 321.024.  REGIONAL MOBILITY AUTHORITIES SUBJECT TO
 AUDIT. A regional mobility authority under Chapter 370,
 Transportation Code, is subject to audit under this chapter as if
 the authority were a department.
 SECTION 3.  Section 370.318, Transportation Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a grant or loan agreement that is
 entered into on or after the effective date of this Act. A grant or
 loan agreement that is entered into before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the agreement
 was entered into, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *