House | 05/11/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 631 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |