Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB657 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 657
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2017; February 14, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the filing of oaths of office and signed statements by
 certain judicial officers and judicial appointees with the
 secretary of state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 602, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 602.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 602.007.  FILING OF OATH MADE BY CERTAIN JUDICIAL
 OFFICERS AND JUDICIAL APPOINTEES.  The oath made and signed
 statement executed as required by Section 1, Article XVI, Texas
 Constitution, by any of the following judicial officers and
 judicial appointees shall be filed with the secretary of state:
 (1)  an officer appointed by the supreme court, the
 court of criminal appeals, or the State Bar of Texas; and
 (2)  an associate judge appointed under Subchapter B or
 C, Chapter 201, Family Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *