House
|
05/20/2017
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 3991
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3977
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1446
|
Journal Page: 3976
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3976
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3976
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2294
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1534
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1350
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1349
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1354
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 292
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 292
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|