Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB687 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 31, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Witness List February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017