House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3572 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1474 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 956 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 394 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 335 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 335 | |
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |