Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB822 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Estes, et al. S.B. No. 822
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2017; February 27, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 4, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 5; April 4, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain property from The University of
 Texas System to the Parks and Wildlife Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2017, the board
 of regents of The University of Texas System shall transfer to the
 Parks and Wildlife Department the real property described by
 Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  The consideration for the transfer authorized by
 Subsection (a) of this section is the requirement that the Parks and
 Wildlife Department use the property transferred only for a public
 golf course, a purpose that benefits the public interest of the
 state. If the Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the
 property for a public golf course, ownership of the property
 automatically reverts to The University of Texas System.
 (c)  The board of regents of The University of Texas System
 shall transfer the property by an appropriate instrument of
 transfer that:
 (1)  includes a provision that:
 (A)  requires the Parks and Wildlife Department to
 use the property for a public golf course, a purpose that benefits
 the public interest of the state; and
 (B)  indicates that ownership of the property
 automatically reverts to The University of Texas System if the
 Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the property for a
 public golf course; and
 (2)  describes the property to be transferred by metes
 and bounds.
 (d)  All contracts, leases, and other obligations governing
 the real property described by Section 2 of this Act in effect on
 the effective date of this Act are transferred to the Parks and
 Wildlife Department.
 (e)  Sections 31.158 and 31.159, Natural Resources Code, do
 not apply to the transfer of real property authorized by this Act.
 SECTION 2.  The real property to which Section 1 of this Act
 refers is described as follows:
 A 141.38 ACRE TRACT OF LAND SITUATED IN THE D. J. GILBERT SURVEY NO.
 8, IN THE CITY OF AUSTIN, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS, BEING A PORTION OF
 THAT CERTAIN 353 ACRE TRACT OF LAND CONVEYED BY GEORGE W.
 BRACKENRIDGE TO THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS BY DEED DATED JUNE 17, 1910
 AND RECORDED IN BOOK 244, PAGES 77 AND 78 OF THE TRAVIS COUNTY,
 TEXAS DEED RECORDS, SAID 141.38 ACRE TRACT OF LAND BEING MORE
 PARTICULARLY DESCRIBED BY METES AND BOUNDS AS FOLLOWS:
 BEGINNING at a 1/2 inch iron pipe found for the most southerly east
 corner of the herein described tract, being the southerly southwest
 corner of that certain 5.53 acre tract of land conveyed to The City
 of Austin for street purposes as Tract Number Three recorded in
 Volume 4993, Pages 489 to 495 of said deed records, being on the
 west line of existing Exposition Boulevard and on the northeast
 line of Lake Austin Boulevard;
 THENCE along the northeast line of said Lake Austin Boulevard in a
 northwesterly direction the following five (5) courses:
 1.  N 29°52'04" W, 383.94 feet to a 1/2 inch iron pipe found
 for a non-tangent point of curvature,
 2.  a distance of 169.14 feet along the arc of a curve to the
 left having a central angle of 2°35'01", a radius of 3,751.04 feet
 and a chord bearing N 31°10'55" W, 169.13 feet to a 1/2 inch iron
 pipe found for a non-tangent point,
 3.  N 32°27'00" W, 2,881.84 feet to a 1/2 inch iron pipe found
 for a non-tangent point of curvature,
 4.  a distance of 659.98 feet along the arc of a curve to the
 right having a central angle of 28°41'48", a radius of 1,317.72 feet
 and a chord bearing N 18°04'40" W, 653.10 feet to a 1/2 inch iron
 pipe found for a non-tangent point, and
 5.  N 03°45'00" W, parallel to and a perpendicular distance of
 50.00 feet east of the monumented centerline of Lake Austin
 Boulevard as shown on drawing number R-6 in the records of the
 Department of Engineering of the City of Austin, Texas, 225.87 feet
 to a 5/8 inch iron rod set for the northwesterly corner of the
 herein described tract;
 THENCE departing the east line of said Lake Austin Boulevard N
 87°44'57" E, at 7.46 feet pass a 5/8 inch iron rod set at the
 southwest corner of Lake Addition, a subdivision recorded in Book
 137, Page 377 of the said deed records, being the southwest corner
 of Park Street, a dedicated sixty (60) foot right-of-way of said
 Lake Addition later vacated by City of Austin Ordinance No. 731213A
 and retained as a sixty (60) foot Public Utility Easement as
 recorded in Volume 4820, Page 598 and continuing along the south
 line of said Lake Addition being the south line of said Park Street
 a total distance of 1,384.86 feet to a 1/2 inch iron pipe found for
 the southeast corner of said Park Street, being on the south line of
 existing Enfield Road;
 THENCE along the south line of Enfield Road S 60°43'03" E, 92.46 feet
 to a 5/8 inch iron rod set at the most northerly southwest corner of
 that certain 5.53 acre tract of land conveyed to the City of Austin
 for street purposes as Tract Number Three recorded in Volume 4993,
 Pages 489 to 495 of said deed records;
 THENCE along the south line of said Enfield Road, being the most
 northerly south line of said 5.53 acre tract S 60°29'08" E, 1,176.72
 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set in the southerly prolongation of the
 centerline of Hopi Trail, being 23.52 feet south of the monumented
 baseline of Enfield Road from Hopi Trail westerly to Schulle Avenue
 as shown in the records of the Department of Engineering of the City
 of Austin;
 THENCE continuing along the south line of said Enfield Road, being
 the most northerly south line of said 5.53 acre tract S 59°04'00" E,
 117.61 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set;
 THENCE departing the south line of said Enfield Road and crossing
 said University tract in a southerly direction the following seven
 courses:
 1.  S 42°14'36" W, 458.84 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
 2.  S 19°36'11" E, 352.49 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
 3.  N 84°48'18" E, 222.56 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
 4.  S 78°55'27" E, 281.07 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
 5.  S 41°50'16" E, 178.37 feet to a 3/4 inch iron rod in a
 concrete monument found marked number 3 as shown on Plan Number
 R-205-A of Metcalfe Engineering Company of Austin, Texas,
 6.  S 31°55'23" E, 75.55 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set, and
 7.  S 13°47'39" E, 332.44 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set on
 the east line of the herein described tract, being on the west line
 of said 5.53 acre tract being the west line of Exposition Boulevard;
 THENCE along the west line of said 5.53 acre tract, being the west
 line of Exposition Boulevard and the east line of the herein
 described tract the following two (2) courses:
 1.  S 29°50'13" W, 736.22 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set, and
 2.  S 29°56'14" W, 1,454.80 feet to the POINT OF BEGINNING
 containing 141.38 acres of land more or less.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *