Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB822 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Estes, et al. S.B. No. 822
2- (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2017; February 27, 2017,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
4- Economic Development; April 4, 2017, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 5; April 4, 2017, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
72
83
94 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
105 AN ACT
116 relating to the transfer of certain property from The University of
127 Texas System to the Parks and Wildlife Department.
138 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
149 SECTION 1. (a) Not later than December 31, 2017, the board
1510 of regents of The University of Texas System shall transfer to the
1611 Parks and Wildlife Department the real property described by
1712 Section 2 of this Act.
1813 (b) The consideration for the transfer authorized by
1914 Subsection (a) of this section is the requirement that the Parks and
2015 Wildlife Department use the property transferred only for a public
2116 golf course, a purpose that benefits the public interest of the
2217 state. If the Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the
2318 property for a public golf course, ownership of the property
2419 automatically reverts to The University of Texas System.
2520 (c) The board of regents of The University of Texas System
2621 shall transfer the property by an appropriate instrument of
2722 transfer that:
2823 (1) includes a provision that:
2924 (A) requires the Parks and Wildlife Department to
3025 use the property for a public golf course, a purpose that benefits
3126 the public interest of the state; and
3227 (B) indicates that ownership of the property
3328 automatically reverts to The University of Texas System if the
3429 Parks and Wildlife Department no longer uses the property for a
3530 public golf course; and
3631 (2) describes the property to be transferred by metes
3732 and bounds.
3833 (d) All contracts, leases, and other obligations governing
3934 the real property described by Section 2 of this Act in effect on
4035 the effective date of this Act are transferred to the Parks and
4136 Wildlife Department.
4237 (e) Sections 31.158 and 31.159, Natural Resources Code, do
4338 not apply to the transfer of real property authorized by this Act.
4439 SECTION 2. The real property to which Section 1 of this Act
4540 refers is described as follows:
4641 A 141.38 ACRE TRACT OF LAND SITUATED IN THE D. J. GILBERT SURVEY NO.
4742 8, IN THE CITY OF AUSTIN, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS, BEING A PORTION OF
4843 THAT CERTAIN 353 ACRE TRACT OF LAND CONVEYED BY GEORGE W.
4944 BRACKENRIDGE TO THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS BY DEED DATED JUNE 17, 1910
5045 AND RECORDED IN BOOK 244, PAGES 77 AND 78 OF THE TRAVIS COUNTY,
5146 TEXAS DEED RECORDS, SAID 141.38 ACRE TRACT OF LAND BEING MORE
5247 PARTICULARLY DESCRIBED BY METES AND BOUNDS AS FOLLOWS:
5348 BEGINNING at a 1/2 inch iron pipe found for the most southerly east
5449 corner of the herein described tract, being the southerly southwest
5550 corner of that certain 5.53 acre tract of land conveyed to The City
5651 of Austin for street purposes as Tract Number Three recorded in
5752 Volume 4993, Pages 489 to 495 of said deed records, being on the
5853 west line of existing Exposition Boulevard and on the northeast
5954 line of Lake Austin Boulevard;
6055 THENCE along the northeast line of said Lake Austin Boulevard in a
6156 northwesterly direction the following five (5) courses:
6257 1. N 29°52'04" W, 383.94 feet to a 1/2 inch iron pipe found
6358 for a non-tangent point of curvature,
6459 2. a distance of 169.14 feet along the arc of a curve to the
6560 left having a central angle of 2°35'01", a radius of 3,751.04 feet
6661 and a chord bearing N 31°10'55" W, 169.13 feet to a 1/2 inch iron
6762 pipe found for a non-tangent point,
6863 3. N 32°27'00" W, 2,881.84 feet to a 1/2 inch iron pipe found
6964 for a non-tangent point of curvature,
7065 4. a distance of 659.98 feet along the arc of a curve to the
7166 right having a central angle of 28°41'48", a radius of 1,317.72 feet
7267 and a chord bearing N 18°04'40" W, 653.10 feet to a 1/2 inch iron
7368 pipe found for a non-tangent point, and
7469 5. N 03°45'00" W, parallel to and a perpendicular distance of
7570 50.00 feet east of the monumented centerline of Lake Austin
7671 Boulevard as shown on drawing number R-6 in the records of the
7772 Department of Engineering of the City of Austin, Texas, 225.87 feet
7873 to a 5/8 inch iron rod set for the northwesterly corner of the
7974 herein described tract;
8075 THENCE departing the east line of said Lake Austin Boulevard N
8176 87°44'57" E, at 7.46 feet pass a 5/8 inch iron rod set at the
8277 southwest corner of Lake Addition, a subdivision recorded in Book
8378 137, Page 377 of the said deed records, being the southwest corner
8479 of Park Street, a dedicated sixty (60) foot right-of-way of said
8580 Lake Addition later vacated by City of Austin Ordinance No. 731213A
8681 and retained as a sixty (60) foot Public Utility Easement as
8782 recorded in Volume 4820, Page 598 and continuing along the south
8883 line of said Lake Addition being the south line of said Park Street
8984 a total distance of 1,384.86 feet to a 1/2 inch iron pipe found for
9085 the southeast corner of said Park Street, being on the south line of
9186 existing Enfield Road;
9287 THENCE along the south line of Enfield Road S 60°43'03" E, 92.46 feet
9388 to a 5/8 inch iron rod set at the most northerly southwest corner of
9489 that certain 5.53 acre tract of land conveyed to the City of Austin
9590 for street purposes as Tract Number Three recorded in Volume 4993,
9691 Pages 489 to 495 of said deed records;
9792 THENCE along the south line of said Enfield Road, being the most
9893 northerly south line of said 5.53 acre tract S 60°29'08" E, 1,176.72
9994 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set in the southerly prolongation of the
10095 centerline of Hopi Trail, being 23.52 feet south of the monumented
10196 baseline of Enfield Road from Hopi Trail westerly to Schulle Avenue
10297 as shown in the records of the Department of Engineering of the City
10398 of Austin;
10499 THENCE continuing along the south line of said Enfield Road, being
105100 the most northerly south line of said 5.53 acre tract S 59°04'00" E,
106101 117.61 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set;
107102 THENCE departing the south line of said Enfield Road and crossing
108103 said University tract in a southerly direction the following seven
109104 courses:
110105 1. S 42°14'36" W, 458.84 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
111106 2. S 19°36'11" E, 352.49 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
112107 3. N 84°48'18" E, 222.56 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
113108 4. S 78°55'27" E, 281.07 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set,
114109 5. S 41°50'16" E, 178.37 feet to a 3/4 inch iron rod in a
115110 concrete monument found marked number 3 as shown on Plan Number
116111 R-205-A of Metcalfe Engineering Company of Austin, Texas,
117112 6. S 31°55'23" E, 75.55 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set, and
118113 7. S 13°47'39" E, 332.44 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set on
119114 the east line of the herein described tract, being on the west line
120115 of said 5.53 acre tract being the west line of Exposition Boulevard;
121116 THENCE along the west line of said 5.53 acre tract, being the west
122117 line of Exposition Boulevard and the east line of the herein
123118 described tract the following two (2) courses:
124119 1. S 29°50'13" W, 736.22 feet to a 5/8 inch iron rod set, and
125120 2. S 29°56'14" W, 1,454.80 feet to the POINT OF BEGINNING
126121 containing 141.38 acres of land more or less.
127122 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
128123 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
129124 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
130125 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
131126 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
132- * * * * *