Senate | 05/18/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 548 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 339 | |
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 339 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |