Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB870 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 870
 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2017; February 27, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 3; March 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the scheduling by an appraisal review board of a hearing
 on a protest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.71, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 41.71.  EVENING AND WEEKEND HEARINGS. An appraisal
 review board by rule shall provide for hearings on protests in the
 evening or on a Saturday [or Sunday]. The board may not schedule a
 hearing on a protest on a Sunday.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a hearing on a protest under Chapter 41, Tax Code, that is
 scheduled on or after the effective date of this Act.  A hearing on a
 protest under Chapter 41, Tax Code, that is scheduled before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the hearing was scheduled, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *