Senate | 03/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 391 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 391 | |
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |