Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB947 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 947
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2017; March 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 947 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to liability of certain electric utilities that allow
 certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or
 leases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 75.007(e), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (e)  This section does not affect Section 75.001, 75.002,
 [75.0021,] 75.003, or 75.004 or create or increase the liability of
 any person.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 75.0021 and 75.0022(b), Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law applicable to the cause of action
 immediately before that date, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *