House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1841 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1287 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1208 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1208 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1208 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 959 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 391 | |
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 391 | |
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |