House | 05/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3886 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2449 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2118 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2118 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2118 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2118 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2118 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2118 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2118 | |
Senate | 05/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2020 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 98 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 98 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |