Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB95 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hall S.B. No. 95
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 24, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; May 16, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 16, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of raw milk and raw milk products; adding
 a provision subject to a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 435, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 435.0061, 435.0062, and
 435.0063 to read as follows:
 Sec. 435.0061.  RAW MILK AND RAW MILK PRODUCTS FOR RETAIL
 SALE. (a)  This section does not authorize the sale of:
 (1)  raw milk or raw milk products to or on the premises
 of a grocery store, supermarket, or similar retail market;
 (2)  raw milk or raw milk products that are a blend of
 raw milk purchased from more than one holder of a permit issued
 under this chapter; or
 (3)  raw milk or raw milk products by a person other
 than the permit holder.
 (b)  Except as provided by Section 435.013, a permit holder
 who is authorized to sell raw milk or raw milk products at retail
 may make retail sales of raw milk or raw milk products directly to a
 consumer in this state at:
 (1)  the permit holder's place of business;
 (2)  the consumer's residence; or
 (3)  a farmers' market as defined by Section 437.020.
 (c)  Raw milk and raw milk products must be maintained in
 compliance with Section 435.0063.
 (d)  A person who sells raw milk or raw milk products under
 this section shall affix to individual raw milk or raw milk product
 containers a label that includes:
 (1)  the name of the permit holder;
 (2)  the permit holder's permit number;
 (3)  the calendar date the raw milk or raw milk product
 was placed in the container; and
 (4)  the following statement:  "This product contains
 unpasteurized milk.  Consuming raw foods, including raw dairy
 products, may increase your risk of food-borne illness.  Persons at
 higher risk for food-borne illness include pregnant and nursing
 women, children, the elderly, and people with weakened immune
 systems."
 Sec. 435.0062.  AVAILABILITY OF RECORDS ON RAW MILK TESTING.
 On request, the department shall provide the requestor with a
 record of test results from an inspection of raw milk or raw milk
 products conducted under Section 435.004 or 435.005.
 Sec. 435.0063.  STORING, HANDLING, AND TRANSPORTING RAW MILK
 AND RAW MILK PRODUCTS FOR RETAIL SALE. (a)  The executive
 commissioner shall adopt rules for the safe storing, handling, and
 transporting of raw milk and raw milk products produced for sale
 under Section 435.0061.
 (b)  Raw milk and raw milk products produced for retail sale
 under this chapter must be placed in a sterile or single-use
 container and sold not later than the fifth day after the date the
 container was filled.
 (c)  Raw milk and raw milk products being transported for
 delivery must be:
 (1)  maintained in air temperatures at or below 45
 degrees Fahrenheit at all times except during transfer from one
 storage area or transportation vehicle to another; and
 (2)  protected from exposure to direct sunlight.
 (d)  The department or a local health authority may not
 mandate the specific method for complying with a temperature
 requirement.
 (e)  A producer may contract with another person to transport
 and deliver raw milk and raw milk products in accordance with this
 section. The producer is jointly and severally liable for
 transport and delivery of raw milk and raw milk products not
 conducted in accordance with this chapter and department rules.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *