E | 06/15/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4245 | |
E | 05/26/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3699 | |
House | 05/26/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5566 | |
Senate | 05/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3317 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3504 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2964 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4662 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Record vote | RV#1769 | Journal Page: 4661 |
House | 05/24/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4661 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4661 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 3151 | |
House | 04/11/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Miles | Journal Page: 948 |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 948 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 947 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 03/07/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |