Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 23, 2017

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2017
Bill March 30, 2017