E | 05/25/2017 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4804 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2963 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3141 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4471 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Record vote | RV#1671 | Journal Page: 4470 |
House | 05/23/2017 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4470 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4470 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3890 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3152 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3152 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1766 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1201 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1146 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |