Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR34 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 25, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 24, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2017
Bill April 18, 2017