Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR34 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/18/2017

                    By: Birdwell S.J.R. No. 34
 (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2017; February 13, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 18, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 18, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 34 By:  Birdwell


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment limiting the service of
 certain officeholders after the expiration of the person's term of
 office.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 17, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 17.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, all [All] officers of [within] this State shall continue
 to perform the duties of their offices until their successors shall
 be duly qualified.
 (b)  Following the expiration of a term of an appointive
 office that is filled by appointment of the Governor with the advice
 and consent of the Senate and that is not an office for which the
 officer receives a salary, the period for which the officer shall
 continue to perform the duties of office under Subsection (a) of
 this section ends on the last day of the first regular session of
 the Legislature that begins after the expiration of the term.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment limiting the service of
 certain officeholders appointed by the governor and confirmed by
 the senate after the expiration of the person's term of office."
 * * * * *