Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR333

Caption

Recognizing March 1, 2017, as Galveston County Day.

Impact

The resolution acknowledges the thriving industrial complex of Galveston County, which features two major deep-water ports that significantly contribute to Texas' economy. Furthermore, Galveston County is recognized as Texas's most popular coastal tourism destination, attracting over six million visitors annually to its beautiful shores. This tourist appeal is not only vital for the county’s local economy but also enhances the overall economic landscape of the state.

Summary

Senate Resolution 333 recognizes March 1, 2017, as Galveston County Day at the Texas Capitol. The resolution celebrates the contributions of Galveston County to the state's history, economy, and culture. It highlights the county's founding in 1836 and its historical significance, particularly noting that the City of Galveston was once the largest city in the Republic of Texas, serving as a center for commerce and culture for several years.

Contention

Moreover, Galveston County is celebrated for its educational institutions, particularly The University of Texas Medical Branch, an international leader in research and education, and Texas A&M University at Galveston, which specializes in marine sciences. This underscores the importance of higher education in sustaining the community's growth and prosperity. Overall, the resolution embodies respect and admiration for the community's hard work and their bright future while embracing a rich historical narrative.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR427

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR246

Recognizing March 1, 2023, as Galveston County Day.

TX HR108

Recognizing March 6, 2025, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR209

Recognizing March 6, 2025, as Galveston County Day.

TX HR1548

Recognizing March 30, 2015, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR677

Recognizing March 1, 2017, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR265

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Galveston County Day.

TX HR591

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Galveston County Day at the State Capitol.