Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate 2017 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB997

Voted on by Senate
 
Out of House Committee
 
Voted on by House
 
Governor Action
 
Bill Becomes Law
 
Relating to peace officer enforcement of federal immigration law at places of worship, hospitals, public schools, and courthouses.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB998

Filed
 
Out of Senate Committee
 
Voted on by Senate
 
Out of House Committee
 
Voted on by House
 
Governor Action
 
Relating to the statute of limitations for the offense of exploitation of a child, elderly individual, or disabled individual.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB999

Filed
 
Out of Senate Committee
 
Voted on by Senate
 
Out of House Committee
 
Voted on by House
 
Governor Action
 
Relating to procedures for taking possession of a child and for certain hearings in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship involving the Department of Family and Protective Services.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR1

Calling on Congress to repeal the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR10

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 25, 2017, and ending on Monday, January 30, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR11

Authorizing the lieutenant governor and the speaker to appoint interim joint committees.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR12

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 1, 2017, and ending on Monday, February 6, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR13

The 85th Legislature of the State of Texas call on all sheriffs' offices in the state to comply with requests included in an immigration detainer issued by the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR14

Expressing support for the completion of La Entrada al Pacifico international trade corridor.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR15

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 8, 2017, and ending on Monday, February 13, 2017.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR16

Encouraging the President of the United States to refrain from threatening elected officials.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR17

Designating Big Spring as the Lighted Poinsettia Capital of Texas.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR18

Relating to the approval of a sufficient balance of the constitutional economic stabilization fund by the 85th Legislature.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR19

Requesting the Texas Workforce Commission to seek a TANF waiver that would allow TWC to partner with charitable organizations and community colleges for child care, education, and job training.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR2

Urging Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification the Parental Rights Amendment to the U.S. Constitution.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records