|
08/15/2017
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
|
|
|
08/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
08/13/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
08/12/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2017
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2017
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
07/27/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2017
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2017
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2017
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
07/24/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
07/24/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
07/24/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
07/20/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|