Texas 2017 - 85th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB13 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 18, 2017

Engrossed

Bill July 28, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 11, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill August 10, 2017
Bill July 25, 2017