08/11/2017 | Effective immediately | |||
08/11/2017 | Signed by the Governor | |||
08/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 08/11/2017 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 08/11/2017 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 08/11/2017 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 08/11/2017 | House passage reported | ||
House | 08/11/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 08/11/2017 | Passed | ||
House | 08/11/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 08/11/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 08/10/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 08/10/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 08/10/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 08/08/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 08/08/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 08/07/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 08/07/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 08/07/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 08/07/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 08/01/2017 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 08/01/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 07/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/20/2017 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 07/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 07/19/2017 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 07/17/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 07/17/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |